Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1432 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 28, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 31, 2024