Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1436 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 28, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2024