Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | CS by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Now in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | CS by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 02/13/24, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/06/24, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Filed |