Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security read 1st time | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Now in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 01/29/24, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Judiciary; Rules | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Filed |