Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1363
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 1363
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 18 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/27/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 3 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/20/24, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/06/24, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|