Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Favorable by Education Postsecondary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Education Postsecondary, 01/22/24, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Referred to Education Postsecondary; Appropriations Committee on Education; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Filed |