Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 1083
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 1083
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/27/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 02/20/24, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/23/24, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/17/24, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|