Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/29/24, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Filed |