Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1534 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 31, 2024