House
|
03/08/2024
|
Died in Messages
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/29/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/24, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 02/20/24, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Now in Finance and Tax
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/16/24, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Referred to Agriculture; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|