Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 3 | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/30/24, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Filed |