Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Regulated Industries | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Now in Regulated Industries | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 4 NAYS 1 | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/30/24, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Regulated Industries; Rules | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Filed |