Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1259
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Substituted CS/HB 1259
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/24, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
CS by Health Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 02/13/24, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
CS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/06/24, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|