Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/23/24, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Filed |