|
04/04/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-58
|
|
|
|
04/04/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/04/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 114, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (604354, 693966)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/22/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/15/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 01/24/24, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|