Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Education, 02/13/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Favorable by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 02/06/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Appropriations Committee on Education; Rules | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Filed |