Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1680 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 28, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2024
Bill January 30, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024