LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S1682
Action History
FL
Florida Senate Bill S1682
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2024 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1682
Action History
Senate
03/08/2024
Died in Judiciary
Senate
01/31/2024
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/05/24, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
Senate
01/24/2024
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/29/24, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
Senate
01/11/2024
Introduced
Senate
01/11/2024
Referred to Judiciary; Rules
Senate
01/05/2024
Filed