Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1684 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2024
Bill January 31, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024