Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 02/13/24, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Now in Finance and Tax | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/29/24, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Filed |