Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Now in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/08/24, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/23/24, 3:30 pm, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Filed |