Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1698 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 7, 2024
Bill February 14, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 7, 2024

Analysis

Analysis March 6, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 24, 2024