Senate | 03/01/2024 | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1415 | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Substituted CS/HB 1415 | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/24 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/14/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/06/24, 11:30 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Now in Criminal Justice | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/29/24, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Criminal Justice; Rules | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Filed |