Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1720 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024