|
03/22/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-23
|
|
|
|
03/22/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/19/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 77, NAYS 36
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 21 NAYS 14
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Amendment(s) failed (116708, 134170, 645598)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (441394, 766718)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/21/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
CS by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/08/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/22/24, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|