Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Favorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 02/08/24, 10:45 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Now in Finance and Tax | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/23/24, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Filed |