|
05/07/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-146
|
|
|
|
05/06/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/22/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 106, NAYS 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Substituted for CS/CS/HB 449
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/24, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
CS by Transportation read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Remaining references corrected to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Original reference(s) removed: Criminal Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
CS by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/06/24, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Referred to Transportation; Criminal Justice; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|