Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Now in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Remaining references corrected to Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | CS by Judiciary read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 2 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/05/24, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | Filed |