Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Died on Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/21/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/08/24, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/30/24, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|