Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Now in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/05/24, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Referred to Judiciary; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Filed |