Senate | 02/08/2024 | Laid on Table, refer to HB 5401 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Substituted HB 5401 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Placed on 3rd reading | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/07/24 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/01/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/31/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Submitted for consideration by Appropriations |