Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S2518 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2024

Analysis

Analysis June 14, 2024
Analysis March 25, 2024
Analysis March 5, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024

Prefiled

Bill January 26, 2024