|
05/13/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-160, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1285 (Ch. 2024-101), CS/CS/HB 1403 (Ch. 2024-163), CS/HB 1425 (Ch. 2024-133)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/25/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (471783)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 117, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment 471783 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Substituted for CS/HB 7025
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/29/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/27/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (573724)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/10/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/14/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/12/2023
|
CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 12/12/23, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/16/2023
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/16/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/15/2023
|
Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 11/15/23, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2023
|
Submitted for consideration by Education Pre-K -12
|
|
|