Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7008 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 5, 2024

Analysis

Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis December 6, 2023
Analysis December 5, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill January 23, 2024

Prefiled

Bill November 27, 2023