Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7022 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2024

Analysis

Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024

Prefiled

Bill January 4, 2024