Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7024 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024

Prefiled

Bill January 4, 2024