House
|
03/08/2024
|
Died in returning Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Requested House to recede
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Refused to concur in 1 amendment(s) (175313)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment 175313 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (814038)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/21/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/08/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/22/24, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/16/24, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Submitted for consideration by Governmental Oversight and Accountability
|
|
|