Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1361
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Substituted CS/HB 1361
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/07/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/01/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/31/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 01/17/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Submitted for consideration by Education Pre-K -12
|
|
|