Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7042 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 28, 2024
Bill February 15, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 28, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024

Prefiled

Bill January 24, 2024