Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Referred to Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 3 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/06/24, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Submitted for consideration by Health Policy |