Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7058 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024

Prefiled

Bill February 1, 2024