Senate | 03/04/2024 | Laid on Table, refer to HB 7071 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Substituted HB 7071 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/24 | ||
Senate | 02/23/2024 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/22/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Referred to Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/06/24, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Submitted for consideration by Governmental Oversight and Accountability |