04/04/2024 | Chapter No. 2024-59 | |||
04/04/2024 | Approved by Governor | |||
04/04/2024 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Ordered enrolled | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Passed; YEAS 114, NAYS 0 | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Added to Third Reading Calendar | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Placed on 3rd reading | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2024) | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | In Messages | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/24 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Appropriations; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/24, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Submitted for consideration by Appropriations |