Florida 2025 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0861 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/20/2025

                               
 
HB 861   	2025 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb861-00 
Page 1 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
A bill to be entitled 1 
An act relating to advanced wastewater treatment ; 2 
providing legislative findings; requiring the 3 
Department of Environmental Protection, in 4 
consultation with the water management districts and 5 
sewage disposal facilities, to submit to the Governor 6 
and Legislature specified reports on certain sewage 7 
disposal facilities in the state ; providing an 8 
effective date. 9 
 10 
Be It Enacted by the Legislature of the State of Fl orida: 11 
 12 
 Section 1. (1)  The Legislature finds that the discharge 13 
of inadequately treated wastewater and aging sewage disposal 14 
facilities compromise the quality of the environment, including 15 
freshwater, brackish water, and nearshore and offshore salt 16 
waters, and threatens the quality of life and local economies in 17 
the state that depend on those resources. The Legislature also 18 
finds that the only practical and cost -effective way to 19 
fundamentally improve wastewater management is to require 20 
advanced wastewater treatment or better at all sewage disposal 21 
facilities with a permitted capacity of greater than 1 million 22 
gallons per day in the state. 23 
 (2)  In order to prioritize the upgrade of sewage disposal 24 
facilities, by December 31, 2025, the Department of 25     
 
HB 861   	2025 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb861-00 
Page 2 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
Environmental Protection, in consultation with the water 26 
management districts and wastewater facilities, shall submit to 27 
the Governor, the President of the Senate, and the Speaker of 28 
the House of Representatives a report detailing all of the 29 
following for all sewage disposal facilities with a permitted 30 
capacity of greater than 1 million gallons per day in the state: 31 
 (a)  Year of construction for the facility and any 32 
maintenance or upgrades. 33 
 (b)  Total permitted volume of water treated daily. 34 
 (c)  Actual permitted volume of water treated daily 35 
including the most recent 1 year and 5 year averages. 36 
 (d)  Current level of treatment, including concentrations 37 
for each of the following: 38 
 1.  Biochemical oxygen demand. 39 
 2.  Suspended solids. 40 
 3.  Total nitrogen. 41 
 4.  Total phosphorus. 42 
 5.  1,4-dioxane. 43 
 6.  Perfluorooctanoic acid. 44 
 7.  Perfluorooctanesulfonic acid. 45 
 8.  Molybdenum. 46 
 9.  Other contaminants of emerging concern as determined by 47 
the department. 48 
 (e)  Estimated total pollutant loading based on permitted 49 
volume and concentrations. 50     
 
HB 861   	2025 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb861-00 
Page 3 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
 (f)  Disposal methods and the volume discharged to any 51 
receiving waterbodies, if applicable, pursuant to s. 52 
403.064(17), Florida Statutes. 53 
 (g)  Impairment status of any receiving waterbodies within 54 
the watershed. 55 
 (h)  Implementation status of total maximum daily loads and 56 
basin management action plans and recommended reductions for 57 
load allocations and wasteload allocations for pollutants of 58 
concern. 59 
 (i)  Total volume and concentration of any permitted and 60 
nonpermitted wastewa ter spills since 2010. 61 
 (j)  Elevation of the facility and supporting 62 
infrastructure. 63 
 (k)  Location within a floodplain, flood zone, or coastal 64 
high-hazard area and, if applicable, the corresponding zone 65 
number. 66 
 (3)  By December 31, 2026, the department, in consultation 67 
with the water management districts and sewage disposal 68 
facilities, shall submit to the Governor, the President of the 69 
Senate, and the Speaker of the House of Representatives a report 70 
outlining a priority ranking process to upgrade all sew age 71 
disposal facilities in the state to advanced waste treatment by 72 
2036, based on all of the following: 73 
 (a)  Overall environmental benefit of a project based on: 74 
 1.  Water quality in receiving waterbodies, including 75     
 
HB 861   	2025 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb861-00 
Page 4 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
impairment status; 76 
 2.  Severity and duration of documented algal blooms; 77 
 3.  Loss of submerged vegetation; 78 
 4.  Death of fish and wildlife; 79 
 5.  Public health advisories; 80 
 6.  Quantity and concentration of permitted and 81 
nonpermitted spills; and 82 
 7.  Risk of failure. 83 
 (b)  Estimated reductio n in nutrient and pollutant loads 84 
with advanced waste treatment. 85 
 (c)  An explanation of additional projects necessary to 86 
meet any adopted total maximum daily loads and basin management 87 
action plans if upgrading to advanced treatment is not 88 
sufficient. 89 
 (d)  Cost-effectiveness as determined by a planning -level 90 
cost estimate. 91 
 (e)  Potential financial assistance available, including 92 
the water quality improvement grant program under s. 403.0673, 93 
Florida Statutes, and availability of local matching funds. 94 
 (f) Project readiness and the estimated date of 95 
completion. 96 
 (4)  By June 30, 2027, the department, in consultation with 97 
the water management districts and sewage disposal facilities, 98 
shall submit to the Governor, President of the Senate, and 99 
Speaker of the House of Representatives a progress report on the 100     
 
HB 861   	2025 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb861-00 
Page 5 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
status of upgrades established under subsection (3) for each 101 
sewage disposal facility with a permitted capacity of greater 102 
than 1 million gallons per day in the state. The report must 103 
include a list of the sewage disposal facilities with a 104 
permitted capacity of greater than 1 million gallons per day 105 
required to upgrade to advanced wastewater treatment, the 106 
preliminary cost estimates for the upgrades, a projected 107 
timeline of the dates by which the upgrades wi ll begin and be 108 
completed, and the date by which operations of the upgraded 109 
sewage disposal facility will begin. 110 
 Section 2. This act shall take effect July 1, 2025. 111