Florida 2025 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0989 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2025

Enrolled

Bill April 24, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 1, 2025
Bill March 18, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 1, 2025
Analysis March 30, 2025
Analysis March 18, 2025
Analysis March 17, 2025