Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 79, NAYS 29
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Amendment 450451 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/9/2025)
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Reported out of Health Care Facilities & Systems Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Favorable by Health Care Facilities & Systems Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
Added to Health Care Facilities & Systems Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Now in Health Care Facilities & Systems Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Referred to Health Care Facilities & Systems Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|