Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Passed; YEAS 114, NAYS 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/16/2025)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Favorable by Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Now in Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Reported out of PreK-12 Budget Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Favorable by PreK-12 Budget Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Added to PreK-12 Budget Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Now in PreK-12 Budget Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Reported out of Student Academic Success Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Favorable by Student Academic Success Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Added to Student Academic Success Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Now in Student Academic Success Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Referred to PreK-12 Budget Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Referred to Student Academic Success Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|