Florida 2025 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1161 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2025

Enrolled

Bill April 23, 2025

Analysis

Analysis May 5, 2025
Analysis April 8, 2025
Analysis April 4, 2025
Analysis March 26, 2025
Analysis March 24, 2025
Analysis March 20, 2025
Analysis March 17, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 8, 2025
Bill March 20, 2025