|
05/01/2025
|
Chapter No. 2025-18
|
|
|
|
04/29/2025
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/22/2025
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
CS passed; YEAS 32 NAYS 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Substituted for CS/SB 806
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
CS passed; YEAS 107, NAYS 3
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/9/2025)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Favorable by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Reported out of Civil Justice & Claims Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Favorable with CS by Civil Justice & Claims Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Added to Civil Justice & Claims Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Now in Civil Justice & Claims Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Referred to Civil Justice & Claims Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|