House | 04/29/2025 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 04/04/2025 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 04/04/2025 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 04/04/2025 | Reported out of Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Favorable by Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Added to Commerce Committee agenda | ||
House | 03/21/2025 | Now in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/21/2025 | Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Favorable by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Filed |